Watson, Mark Alexander (CPSO#: 80492)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 10 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of London, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Feb 2004 to 19 Apr 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 20 Apr 2004 to 10 Jul 2004
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Apr 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Jul 2004