Watson, Paul Andrew (CPSO#: 65563)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 308
1265 East Arthur Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7E 6E7
Phone: (807) 622-5452
Fax: (807) 622-5710
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul A. Watson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 17 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Watson ( CPSO# 65563 )

Business Address:
308 - 1265 East Arthur Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7E 6E7
Phone Number: (807) 622-5452

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Rainy River Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities Rainy River
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nephrology Effective: 31 Oct 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL ANDREW WATSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WATSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Oct 1997
Resident 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993