Watson, Shayna Lynn (CPSO#: 65198)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
220 Bagot Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5E9
Phone: (613) 533-9300
Fax: (613) 544-9899
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAYNA LYNN WATSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WATSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1993