Watson, Wayne Robert (CPSO#: 20421)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013