Watt, Francis James (CPSO#: 23429)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Aberdeen, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 17 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2007