Watt, James Hamilton (CPSO#: 52648)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Mar 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Mar 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
700 Main Street East
Hamilton ON  L8M 1K7
Phone: (905) 549-5611
Fax: (905) 549-0302
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Caledonia X-Ray Ultrasound
248 Argyle Street
Caledonia ON  N3W 1K6
Canada
Phone: (905) 765-4059
Fax: (905) 765-5755
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES HAMILTON WATT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WATT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1983 to 14 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 1988