Watt, John Alexander (CPSO#: 22488)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Aberdeen, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 04 Dec 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Dec 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 Oct 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008