Watters, Andrew Kevin (CPSO#: 45973)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McGill University Health Centre
1001 Decarie Blvd
Montreal QC  H4A 3J1
Phone: (514) 934-1934 Ext. 43840
Fax: (514) 934-8296

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 04 Dec 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW KEVIN WATTERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WATTERS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1993