Watters, Conrad William Lawrence (CPSO#: 32158)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jan 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jan 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 400
11 Holland Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4S1
Phone: (613) 829-1266
Fax: (613) 482-4850
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Conrad W. Watters, Medicine, Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 3 2006


Corporation Name: Dr. Conrad W. Watters, Medicine, Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 08 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Watters ( CPSO# 32158 )

Business Address:
400 - 11 Holland Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4S1
Phone Number: (613) 829-1266

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 25 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CONRAD WILLIAM LAWRENCE WATTERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WATTERS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 1981