Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Watterson, James David (CPSO#: 68875)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa General Hospital
Box 222
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8373
Fax: (613) 739-6719
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James Watterson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 05 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Watterson ( CPSO# 68875 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
501 Smyth Room Box 222
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8373

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES DAVID WATTERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WATTERSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2000