Watterud, Donna Lynne (CPSO#: 52175)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Apr 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Apr 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thamesview Centre for
Family Medicine
465 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7L 1C5
Phone: 519-351-6464
Fax: 519-351-4890
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Donna L. Watterud Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Watterud ( CPSO# 52175 )

Business Address:
465 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7L 1C5
Phone Number: (519) 351-6464

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
St Joseph's Health Services,Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONNA LYNNE WATTERUD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WATTERUD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 1984