Watts, Kingsley Fraser (CPSO#: 58047)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Oct 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Runnymede Health Centre
625 Runnymede Road
Toronto ON  M6S 3A3
Phone: 6472296010
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Rehab. Institute
E W Bickle Centre
130 Dunn Ave.
Toronto ON  M6K 2R7
Canada
Phone: (416) 597-3422 Ext. 2245
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kingsley F. Watts Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Watts ( CPSO# 58047 )

Business Address:
625 Runnymede Road
Toronto ON  M6S 3A3
Phone Number: (647) 229-6010

Business Address:
130 Dunn Avenue
Toronto ON  M6K 2R7
Phone Number: (647) 229-6010

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Runnymede Healthcare Centre Toronto
University Health Network,E.W. Bickle Centre for Complex Continuing Care Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KINGSLEY FRASER WATTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WATTS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1988