Waxman, Mark Lawrence (CPSO#: 29280)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Jun 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1977
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 18 Nov 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jun 2016

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 18 Nov 2002
Summary:

On November 18, 2002, Dr. Mark Lawrence Waxman plead no contest to the allegations against 
him.  The Discipline Committee found him guilty of professional misconduct in that he sexually 
abused a patient, engaged in sexual impropriety with a patient, and engaged in unacceptable 
conduct. The alleged conduct related to three patients. 
 
The Discipline Committee ordered the following penalty: 
 
      (i)   Dr. Waxman will attend before the Discipline Committee to be reprimanded; 

      (ii)  Dr. Waxman s certificate of registration will be revoked, such revocation to take effect immediately; 

      (iii) Dr. Waxman will pay costs to the College in the amount of $2,500.00; 

      (iv)  Dr. Waxman will reimburse the College for any amount the College may pay, up to a maximum of $10,000 
            for funding for therapy and counseling for one of the patients (Patient A) under section 85.7 of the Health 
            Professions Procedural Code. 

 

On June 9, 2008, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario considered the application for 
reinstatement by Dr. Mark Lawrence Waxman, pursuant to Section 72 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, and directed 
the Registrar to issue a certificate of registration to the applicant, Dr. Mark Lawrence Waxman, subject to the following terms 
and conditions: 

                                    (i)    Dr. Waxman will have a chaperone present 
            for all professional encounters with female patients.   The chaperone will be a 
            registered health professional acceptable to the College and will execute an 
            undertaking which will include keeping a log of all female patient visits.   

                                    (ii)  The College will be entitled to monitor Dr. 
            Waxman s OHIP billings and patient records on a quarterly basis until the 
            re-assessment of his practice as contemplated by (ix) below has been satisfactorily 
            finalized.  Such quarterly monitoring to be accomplished by means of 
            submissions to the College of such OHIP billings, patient records and log book as 
            the College shall specify.  This provision does not restrict the College from 
            attending at Dr. Waxman s practice location, at other times while clause (i) is in 
            force, to request and review such OHIP billings, patient records and log books as 
            contemplated by this provision to ensure compliance with the terms of his 
            certificate of registration. 

                                    (iii) Dr. Waxman will continue to receive 
            treatment from Dr. X, or any other certified psychiatrist acceptable to the College 
            who will provide reports to the College on a quarterly basis for a period of five (5) 
            years from the date of this Order.  Thereafter, Dr. Waxman will continue to 
            receive treatment from a psychiatrist on an ongoing basis who will report to the 
            College if he or she has concerns as to Dr. Waxman s fitness to continue in 
            practice.  The frequency of treatment shall be at the discretion of the treating 
            psychiatrist but not less than quarterly.  Dr. Waxman will comply with all 
            treatment recommendations of his treating psychiatrist.    

                                    (iv)  Dr. Waxman will enter into a five (5) year 
            contract with the Physician Health Program (that is, until 2013). 

                                    (v)   Dr. Waxman will practice in a group setting, 
            under the supervision of a practice monitor acceptable to the College, who will 
            execute an undertaking and who will report to the College on a quarterly basis. 

                                    (vi)  In the event that any of the reports 
            contemplated by this Order are not received in accordance with the time frame 
            specified and if such failure is not rectified within thirty (30) days of notice of the 
            non-compliance being given to Dr. Waxman, the Registrar may suspend his 
            certificate of registration until the report(s) is received. 

                                    (vii)  Dr. Waxman will go through the re-entry to 
            practice program and comply with any requirements or recommendations. 

                                    (viii)  Dr. Waxman will re-enter practice on a 
            graduated basis beginning with no more than twenty (20) hours per week and no 
            more than five (5) hours per day for the first three (3) months of practice.  

                                    (ix)  Dr. Waxman will agree to and cooperate in a 
            reassessment of his clinical practice one (1) year after his return to practice.  This 
            will include the College reviewing his billing records and log books.  The costs 
            for the reassessment shall be borne by Dr. Waxman. 

                                    (x)    The costs of the chaperone, monitoring and 
            reporting shall be borne by Dr. Waxman. 

2.                                  THE DISCIPLINE COMMITTEE retains 
jurisdiction on the application of a party to vary the terms and conditions of this order. 

3.         THE DISCIPLINE COMMITTEE DIRECTS the results of this proceeding to be 
included on the register. 

 

  

 

 

 

  

 
              

              

              

              

              

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Nov 18, 2002

Application for Reinstatement   Download Reinstatement Decision (PDF)
Decision Date: 09 Jun 2008
Decision: Application Accepted