Waxman, Menashe Benjamin (CPSO#: 22966)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Menashe B. Waxman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 5 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: Medical Records Toronto General Hospital Tel: 416-340-4800 Ext: 3416 Fax: 416-340-3829
Date Received: 24 Jun 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 21 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2014