Waye, Jerome Donar (CPSO#: 67400)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 05 Oct 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Boston University, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Oct 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Oct 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Oct 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Oct 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Oct 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Sep 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Oct 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Oct 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Sep 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 24 May 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 May 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Oct 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Oct 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Oct 2012