Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Weatherall, Paul Ian (CPSO#: 63795)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Loyalist Family Practice
Unit 2A
150 Sidney Street
Belleville ON  K8P 5E2
Phone: (613) 771-0008
Fax: (613) 771-1861
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul Weatherall Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 14 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Weatherall ( CPSO# 63795 )

Business Address:
2A - 150 Sidney Street
Belleville ON  K8P 5E2
Phone Number: (613) 771-0008

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL IAN WEATHERALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEATHERALL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1992