Weatherdon, Derek Scott (CPSO#: 68772)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Associates
Suite 100
155 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P2
Phone: (905) 945-5476
Fax: (905) 945-7707
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Derek Weatherdon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 03 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Weatherdon ( CPSO# 68772 )

Business Address:
Medical Associates
100 - 155 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P2
Phone Number: (905) 945-5476

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEREK SCOTT WEATHERDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEATHERDON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Nov 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2007