Weaver, William George (CPSO#: 53361)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 05 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Aug 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1983
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Aug 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2004
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2006
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Aug 2010

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 22 Sep 2011
Summary:

On September 22, 2011, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. William George Weaver 
committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in conduct or an act or omission 
relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. 
 
The Committee determined that Dr. Weaver engaged in a sexual relationship with a vulnerable 
patient within one day of the termination of the doctor-patient relationship.  
 
On February 8, 2012, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
1.    the Registrar suspend Dr. Weaver's certificate of registration for six (6) months. This 
      suspension is to take effect if and when Dr. Weaver's certificate of registration is 
      reinstated, commencing on the day the certificate is reinstated. 
 
2.    the Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Weaver's 
      certificate of registration if and when it is reinstated: 
      a.    Dr. Weaver shall not engage in any professional encounter or interaction with any 
            female patient except in the presence of a monitor. Dr. Weaver will be responsible 
            for the associated costs of the monitor; 
      b.    that Monitor shall be a member of a health profession pursuant to the terms of the 
            Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18 as amended, who is 
            acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons (the "College"); 
      c.    the Monitor must remain in the examination or consulting room at all times 
            during all professional encounters with all female patients; 
      d.    the Monitor is required to carefully observe all physical examinations of all  
            female patients, including but not limited to internal examinations of female 
            patients; 
      e.    the Monitor is required to maintain a log of all female patient encounters and that 
            the log shall provide the name of the female patient, and the purpose and date of 
            the appointment.  The Monitor will sign and date the corresponding entry on the 
            female patient's medical record; 
      f.    Dr. Weaver shall post a sign in his office and consulting rooms notifying patients 
            of subparagraphs (a) and (b) above in English;    
      g.    Dr. Weaver shall cooperate with unannounced inspections of his practice and such 
            other steps as the College may take for the purpose of monitoring and enforcing 
            his compliance with the terms of this Order; and 
      h.    Dr. Weaver shall successfully complete, at his own expense, the College's 
            Understanding Boundary Issues and Managing the Risks Inherent in the 
            Doctor-Patient Relationship and an educational program in ethics approved by the 
            College. 
 
3.    Dr. Weaver appear before the panel to be reprimanded if and when he is reinstated.  
 
4.    Dr. Weaver pay costs to the College in the amount of $7,300. 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): July 12-13, 2011