Webb, Gary Douglas (CPSO#: 21766)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Apr 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Apr 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 02 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 23 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GARY DOUGLAS WEBB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEBB is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1969
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2017