Webb, Irma Ashley Skrob (CPSO#: 58628)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jan 1989

Summary

Former Name: Webb, Irma Ashley (used until: 12 Apr 1992 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 2 - 1
555 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1A8
Phone: (905) 387-0831
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IRMA ASHLEY SKROB WEBB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEBB is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 1989