Webb, Janet Linda (CPSO#: 56892)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Feb 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Feb 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Tri Area Medical Centre
52 St Lawrence Street East
Madoc ON  K0K 2K0
Phone: (613) 473-4134
Fax: (613) 473-4740
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Janet Webb Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 06 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Webb ( CPSO# 56892 )

Business Address:
Tri Area Medical Centre
52 St Lawrence Street East
Madoc ON  K0K 2K0
Phone Number: (613) 473-4134

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANET LINDA WEBB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEBB is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Aug 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2004