Webb, John Graydon (CPSO#: 52211)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 11 May 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 May 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 30 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Jun 1982 to 13 Jun 1983
PostGrad Yr 1 - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 May 2010