Webb, Stephen Paul (CPSO#: 54695)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Oct 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2757 King Street East
Hamilton ON  L8G 5E4
Phone: (905) 573-4801
Fax: (905) 573-4802
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

West Niagara Mental Health Team
167A Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P2
Canada
Phone: (905) 309-3336
Fax: (905) 309-4446
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen Webb Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Webb ( CPSO# 54695 )

Business Address:
2757 King Street East
Hamilton ON  L8G 5E4
Phone Number: (905) 573-4801

Business Address:
167A Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P2
Phone Number: (905) 309-3336

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 07 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN PAUL WEBB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEBB is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 1988