Webber, Gail Colleen (CPSO#: 64775)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jan 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Units 11 and 12
2450 Lancaster Road
Ottawa ON  K1B 5N3
Phone: (613) 738-9119
Fax: (613) 738-2736
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gail Webber Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Webber ( CPSO# 64775 )

Business Address:
Suites 11 & 12
2450 Lancaster Road
Ottawa ON  K1B 5N3
Phone Number: (613) 738-9119

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GAIL COLLEEN WEBBER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEBBER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 15 Jan 1992 to 30 Jun 1992
Other - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Other - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jan 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1993
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Jan 1994