Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Webber, Paul Francis (CPSO#: 68261)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesia
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9090 Ext. 46550
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

5 Quarry Ridge Rd Barrie, ON
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Canada
Phone: (705) 797-1112
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Webber Skory Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 12 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Webber ( CPSO# 68261 )
Dr. L. Skory ( CPSO# 69408 )

Business Address:
Department of Anaesthesia
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Business Address:
490 Huronia Road
Barrie ON  L4N 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 734-9690

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL FRANCIS WEBBER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEBBER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999