Weber, Linda Jane (CPSO#: 72612)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6860
Fax: (416) 530-6160
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Linda J. Weber Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 05 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Weber ( CPSO# 72612 )

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6860

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINDA JANE WEBER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEBER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000