Webert, Kathryn Elizabeth (CPSO#: 69910)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 May 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Canadian Blood Services
Medical Office
35 Stone Church Road
Ancaster ON  L9K 1S5
Phone: (905) 304-7282
Fax: (905) 648-8417
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 25 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHRYN ELIZABETH WEBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEBERT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 May 2001