Webster, Christine Evelyn (CPSO#: 51428)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Aug 1983

Summary

Former Name: Kalbfleisch, Christine Evelyn (used until: 06 Oct 2003 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Professional Building
Suite 203
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone: (905) 820-1748
Fax: (905) 820-7445
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christine Webster Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 08 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Webster ( CPSO# 51428 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Professional Building
Suite 203
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone Number: (905) 820-1748

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 19 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE EVELYN WEBSTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEBSTER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1983