Webster, David Marshall (CPSO#: 27288)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 22 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist
General Surgery Effective: 06 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 1999