Webster, Peter Maclean (CPSO#: 21956)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jun 1969

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1969

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
D674A
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto, Ont. M4N 3M5
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4427
Fax: (416) 480-4186
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER MACLEAN WEBSTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEBSTER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Nov 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1972