Webster, Todd Michael (CPSO#: 72368)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 May 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 May 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 209
1101 2nd Avenue East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 2J1
Phone: (519) 370-2266
Fax: (519) 372-0731
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Todd M. Webster Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Webster ( CPSO# 72368 )

Business Address:
209 - 1101 2nd Avenue East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 2J1
Phone Number: (519) 370-2266

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Markdale Site Markdale
Grey Bruce Health Services,Meaford Site Meaford
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital Southampton
Grey Bruce Health Services,Wiarton Site Wiarton
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Durham-Memorial Site Durham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TODD MICHAEL WEBSTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEBSTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 May 2004