Wedge, Charlotte Isabel (CPSO#: 59993)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jan 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 308
20 Wynford Drive
Toronto ON  M3C 1J4
Phone: (416) 922-2052
Fax: (416) 922-3013
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Charlotte I. Wedge Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Wedge ( CPSO# 59993 )

Business Address:
Suite 308
20 Wynford Drive
Toronto ON  M3C 1J4
Phone Number: (416) 922-2052

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Don Mills Surgical Unit Limited Toronto
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 15 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLOTTE ISABEL WEDGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEDGE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Sep 1992
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 1992