Wedge, John Hall (CPSO#: 24846)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Apr 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Apr 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10 Delisle Ave.
PH01
Toronto ON  M4V 3C6
Phone: (912)306-9469
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 13 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN HALL WEDGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEDGE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Aug 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 1988