Wee, Andy Teck Huat (CPSO#: 94873)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Feb 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Feb 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National University of Singapore, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 03 Mar 2011 to 24 May 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 25 May 2011 to 29 Feb 2012
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2012