Wee, Joy Yenn May (CPSO#: 66942)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Seymour Medical Clinic
1530 West 7th Avenue
Vancouver BC  V6J 1S3
Phone: (604) 738-2151
Fax: (604) 738-2102

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018