Weeks, Adrienne Christine (CPSO#: 79608)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 602 500 University Avenue Toronto, ON M5G 1V7
Date Received: 29 May 2014

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017