Weeks, Andrew Stephen (CPSO#: 29498)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jul 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 103
7 Grand Avenue South
Cambridge ON  N1S 2L3
Phone: (519) 623-9330
Fax: (519) 623-0552
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Weeks Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 04 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Weeks ( CPSO# 29498 )

Business Address:
103 - 7 Grand Avenue South
Cambridge ON  N1S 2L3
Phone Number: (519) 623-9330

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
West Haldimand,General Hospital Hagersville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 26 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW STEPHEN WEEKS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEEKS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1977