Weerasena, Nihal Anurakumar (CPSO#: 67410)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2002


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Rajasthan University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Nov 1996
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Jun 2001
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2001
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2002