Wehrspann, William Holt (CPSO#: 27915)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:State University of Iowa, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto West Professional Centre
Suite 419
2425 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6S 4W4
Phone: (416) 909-7621
Fax: (416) 769-3517
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. W. H. Wehrspann Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 05 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Wehrspann ( CPSO# 27915 )

Business Address:
Toronto West Professional Centre
419 - 2425 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6S 4W4
Phone Number: (416) 769-7996

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM HOLT WEHRSPANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEHRSPANN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 1975
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2002