Wei, Charles Chia-Ying (CPSO#: 70130)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 401
95 Bayly Street West
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone: (905) 686-3351
Fax: (905) 427-2679
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Canada
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Fax: (905) 721-4735
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Lakeridge Health Whitby
300 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5T2
Canada
Phone: (905) 668-6831
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

1550 Kingston Road
Suite 6
Pickering ON  L1V 1C3
Canada
Phone: (905) 831-1200
Fax: (905) 831-9493
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

815 High Street
Unit 7
Peterborough ON  K9J 8J9
Canada
Phone: (705) 876-8737
Fax: (705) 876-9060
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Charles Wei Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Wei ( CPSO# 70130 )

Business Address:
58 Hoile Drive
Ajax ON  L1Z 1M7
Phone Number: (905) 428-6589

Business Address:
401 - 95 Bayly Street West
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone Number: (905) 686-3351

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Whitby
300 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5T2
Phone Number: (905) 668-6831

Business Address:
Dialysis Management Clinic - Peterborough
7 - 815 High Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 8J9
Phone Number: (705) 876-8737

Business Address:
Dialysis Management Clinic - Pickering
6 - 1550 Kingston Road
Pickering ON  L1V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 831-1200

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health,Whitby Site Whitby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 05 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLES CHIA-YING WEI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000