Wei, Nissi (CPSO#: 106088)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Kitchissippi Clinic
Unit #600
1081 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4G2
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

100 Marie-Curie Private
1st floor
Ottawa ON  K1N 9N3
Canada
Phone: (613) 564-3950
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NISSI WEI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2017