Wei, Xingchang (CPSO#: 82170)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:West China Medical University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2005 to 11 Mar 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 12 Mar 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Sep 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2005