Weicker, Constance Marie (CPSO#: 56893)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Dec 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 209
12295 Highway 50
Bolton ON  L7E 1M2
Phone: (905) 951-3696
Fax: (905) 951-3698
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.M. Weicker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 24 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Weicker ( CPSO# 56893 )

Business Address:
209 - 12295 Highway 50
Bolton ON  L7E 1M2
Phone Number: (905) 951-3696

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CONSTANCE MARIE WEICKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEICKER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 1987