Weiglein, Otto (CPSO#: 33397)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jan 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
520 Locust Street
Burlington ON  L7S 1V2
Phone: (905) 634-5573
Fax: (905) 634-5406
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 25 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OTTO WEIGLEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEIGLEIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Dec 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2013