Weiler, Peter Joseph (CPSO#: 56977)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Nov 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 304
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone: (416) 441-2245
Fax: (416) 441-2246
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Canada
Phone: (416) 469-6580 Ext. 6384
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Weiler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 01 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Weiler ( CPSO# 56977 )

Business Address:
Suite 304
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone Number: (416) 441-2245

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER JOSEPH WEILER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEILER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Research Fellows - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 1987