Weinberg, Garry Bruce (CPSO#: 74741)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 207
4 Montreal Road
Cornwall ON  K6H 1B1
Phone: (613) 938-9200
Fax: (613) 937-4154
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GARRY BRUCE WEINBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEINBERG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2005