Weinberg, Jeffrey Neil (CPSO#: 69920)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 102
8920 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 9W9
Phone: (905) 305-9484
Fax: (905) 305-7381
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 100
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Canada
Phone: (905) 773-7759
Fax: (905) 773-1325
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jeff Weinberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 22 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Weinberg ( CPSO# 69920 )

Business Address:
Suite 102
8920 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 9W9
Phone Number: (905) 305-9484

Business Address:
Suite 100
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone Number: (905) 773-7759

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY NEIL WEINBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEINBERG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1998