Weinberg, Robert Brian (CPSO#: 72464)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Toronto Health Centre
Suite 400
85 The East Mall
Toronto ON  M8Z 5W4
Phone: (416) 621-2220
Fax: (416) 621-2203
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Weinberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Weinberg ( CPSO# 72464 )

Business Address:
West Toronto Health Centre
85 The East Mall
Suite 400
Toronto ON  M8Z 5W4
Phone Number: (416) 621-2220

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT BRIAN WEINBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEINBERG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2000