Weinberg, Victor (CPSO#: 15718)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Jun 2000

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1951

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jan 1956 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1956
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jun 2000

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 12 Feb 1988
Summary:

 In February 1988, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Weinberg guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in s. 27(21) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the 
 standard of practice of the profession.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Weinberg be 
 reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register.  The Committee also 
 ruled that the Doctor's licence to practice be suspended for a period of two months.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 09 Dec 1987