Weiner-Baron, David Lyon (CPSO#: 52933)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Apr 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 303
4800 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2J 2K9
Phone: (647) 345-2120
Fax: (647) 345-2124
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Weiner-Baron Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 30 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Weiner-Baron ( CPSO# 52933 )

Business Address:
Suite 401
4800 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2J 2K9
Phone Number: (647) 345-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 20 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID LYON WEINER-BARON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEINER-BARON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 1985